VA SB1210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil action for unlawful creation of image of another or unlawful dissemination or sale of images of another. Creates a civil cause of action against an individual who knowingly and intentionally (i) creates any videographic or still image of any nonconsenting person who is nude, clad in undergarments, or in a state of undress or (ii) captures an image of a person's intimate parts or undergarments when those captured parts or undergarments would not otherwise be visible to the general public. The bill also creates a civil cause of action against an individual who maliciously disseminates or sells any videographic or still image that depicts another person who is nude or in a state of undress where such person knows that he is not licensed or authorized to disseminate or sell such videographic or still image. The bill provides that compensatory damages, punitive damages, and reasonable attorney fees and costs may be awarded.
Title
Unlawful creation of image of another; civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1210ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 17105469D-H1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y -0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1210H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105469D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105469D-H1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102759D-E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1210E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102759D |