VA SB1209 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Grants for earning workforce training credentials; New Economy Industry Credential Assistance Training Grants. Establishes a grant program that would pay grants to certain individuals enrolled at a two-year or four-year public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth in a noncredit workforce training program as a prerequisite to earning a related credential in a high-demand field. The grant, up to a total of $1,000, would be limited to payment of tuition charged for the training program, the cost of any required textbooks, and the cost of any examination required to earn the credential. The Virginia Board of Workforce Development would maintain a list of high-demand fields and the related credentials on its website, and the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia would administer the grants. The amount of grants available each year for the program would be determined by the general appropriation act. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2016.
Title
New Economy Industry Credential Assistance Training Grants; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Ralph Smith [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] | Sen. William Stanley [R] |
Del. Thomas Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1209S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104814D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104814D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103444D |