VA SB1208 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Virginia-Taiwan Trade Office. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to conduct a cost-benefit analysis of establishing a Virginia-Taiwan Trade Office to serve as the official representation of the Commonwealth in Taiwan by promoting and offering services relating to economic development and trade. Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Virginia-Taiwan Trade Office. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to conduct a cost-benefit analysis of establishing a Virginia-Taiwan Trade Office to serve as the official representation of the Commonwealth in Taiwan by promoting and offering services relating to economic development and trade.
Title
Virginia-Taiwan Trade Office; Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1208ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1208S2 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106087D-S2 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Commerce and Labor Committee substitute rejected 23105130D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106087D-S2 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105130D-S1 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103365D |