VA SB1207 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1207
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solar and energy storage projects; siting agreements and special exceptions throughout the Commonwealth. Expands existing provisions related to siting agreements and zoning special exceptions for solar projects located in an opportunity zone to include energy storage projects and makes the provisions statewide. The bill provides that its provisions shall not apply to any energy storage project that has received zoning and site plan approval, preliminary or otherwise, from the host locality before January 1, 2021. The bill also provides that its provisions shall not become effective with respect to energy storage projects unless the General Assembly approves legislation that authorizes localities to adopt an ordinance for taxation of energy storage projects such as solar projects with a local option for machinery and tools tax or solar revenue share.
Title
Solar and energy storage projects; siting agreements throughout the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 15-N 2-A) (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1207ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 15-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House (81-Y 15-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1207S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103169D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103169D-S1 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102067D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1207 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
HB2201 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
HB2201 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
HB2201 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
HB2201 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2316.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2316.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |