VA SB1207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 46-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 46-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
School protection officers; minimum training standards; exemption. Defines a school protection officer as a retired law-enforcement officer hired on a part-time basis by the local law-enforcement agency to provide limited law-enforcement and security services to Virginia public elementary and secondary schools. The bill also provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services shall establish compulsory minimum training standards for all persons employed as school protection officers and that such training may be provided by the employing law-enforcement agency and shall be graduated and based on the type of duties to be performed.
Title
School protection officers; definition, compulsory minimum training standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 46-N) (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Defeated by House (44-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1207S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105551D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105551D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102807D |