VA SB1205 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1205

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Programs to address career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; civil immunity. Expands civil immunity for health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to review, evaluate, or make recommendations related to health care services to include health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to address issues related to career fatigue and wellness in health care professionals licensed, registered, or certified by the Boards of Medicine, Nursing, or Pharmacy, or in students enrolled in a school of medicine, osteopathic medicine, nursing, or pharmacy located in the Commonwealth. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; programs to address, civil immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21101126D

Same As/Similar To

SB1205 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412400.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5412909(n/a)See Bill Text
801581.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback