VA SB1202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance policies; bad faith. Provides that if an insurance company denies, refuses, or fails to pay its insured, or refuses a reasonable settlement demand within the policy's coverage limits, for a claim for uninsured or underinsured motorist benefits within a reasonable time after being presented with a demand for such benefits and it is subsequently found that such denial, refusal, or failure was not in good faith, then the insurance company is liable to the insured for the full amount of the judgment and reasonable attorney fees, expenses, and interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance policies; bad faith.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 9-N)
2021-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100921D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822206(n/a)See Bill Text
80166.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback