VA SB1202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial Space Flight Authority. Requires the Executive Director of the Commercial Space Flight Authority (the Authority) to develop and present to the Authority's board of directors (the Board) every four years a six-year strategic plan for its adoption and eliminates the requirement that a strategic plan be submitted to the Governor and General Assembly every four years. The bill also clarifies that the public purpose of the Authority is to promote (i) industrial and economic development and (ii) scientific and technological research and development for the commercial space flight industry. The bill provides that the Executive Director of the Authority also serves as the Chief Executive Officer; specifies that the Governor's appointments to the Board have experience in the aerospace industry, the financial industry, higher education, or the marketing industry or in scientific research and development; and eliminates the requirement that the Board form a nonvoting advisory committee.
Title
Commercial Space Flight Authority; development of six-year strategic plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with amendment (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with amendment (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1202ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with amendment (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102147D-E |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1202E |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102147D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |