VA SB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-21 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $10 per hour effective July 1, 2019, to $13 per hour effective July 1, 2020, and to $15 per hour effective July 1, 2021, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The measure also provides that the Virginia minimum wage applies to persons whose employment is covered by the FLSA and to persons employed by the Commonwealth, its agencies or political subdivisions, or a public body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; increase to $10 per hour effective July 1, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-21SenateDefeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
2019-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-01-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Petersen rejected (19-Y 21-N)
2019-01-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-21SenateFloor substitute printed 19105253D-S1 (Petersen)
2019-01-21SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (6-Y 4-N)
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101555D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4012.1(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.10(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback