VA SB1199 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1199
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation easements; construction. Provides that an easement held pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act or the Open-Space Land Act be construed in favor of achieving the conservation purposes for which it was created.
Title
Conservation easements; construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments agreed to (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments agreed to (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 274 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1199ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21100906D-E |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1199E |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to (23-Y 16-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103368D-S1 (Stuart) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100906D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1199 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
HB1760 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
HB1760 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
HB1760 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
HB1760 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1016.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |