VA SB1199 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Conservation easements; construction. Provides that an easement held pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act or the Open-Space Land Act be construed in favor of achieving the conservation purposes for which it was created. Conservation easements; construction. Provides that an easement held pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act or the Open-Space Land Act be construed in favor of achieving the conservation purposes for which it was created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation easements; construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments agreed to (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
2021-01-26SenatePrinted as engrossed 21100906D-E
2021-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1199E
2021-01-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to (23-Y 16-N)
2021-01-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-26SenateRead second time
2021-01-25SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-22SenateFloor substitute printed 21103368D-S1 (Stuart)
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100906D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011016.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1011705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1199
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1199+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1199S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1199E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1199AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1199F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1199FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1199FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0019+SB1199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0068SB1199+SB1199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0127SB1199+SB1199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0144SB1199+SB1199

Bill Comments

feedback