VA SB1196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
James River State Scenic River designation. Extends the scenic river designation of a portion of the James River located in Botetourt and Rockbridge Counties from 14 miles to 59 miles. This bill is identical to HB 1454.
Title
James River; designation portion a component of Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1196ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 17105510D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (85-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1196H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105510D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105510D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101286D-E |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1196E |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101286D |
Subjects
Amherst County
Bedford County
Botetourt County
Conservation
James River
Rockbridge County
Scenic Rivers
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Bedford County
Botetourt County
Conservation
James River
Rockbridge County
Scenic Rivers
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors