VA SB1195 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1195

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Provides that a policy or contract of bodily injury and property damage liability insurance for the use of a motor vehicle shall contain an endorsement or provisions obligating the insurer to make payment for injury or damage caused by an underinsured vehicle without any credit, set-off, or reduction for the available bodily injury and property damage coverage. The bill provides that a motor vehicle is underinsured when the total amount of bodily injury and property damage coverage applicable to the operation or use of the motor vehicle and available for payment for such bodily injury or property damage, is less than the total amount of damages sustained up to the total amount of uninsured motorist coverage afforded any person injured. Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Provides that a policy or contract of bodily injury and property damage liability insurance for the use of a motor vehicle shall contain an endorsement or provisions obligating the insurer to make payment for injury or damage caused by an underinsured vehicle without any credit, set-off, or reduction for the available bodily injury and property damage coverage. The bill provides that a motor vehicle is underinsured when the total amount of bodily injury and property damage coverage applicable to the operation or use of the motor vehicle and available for payment for such bodily injury or property damage, is less than the total amount of damages sustained up to the total amount of uninsured motorist coverage afforded any person injured.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle, uninsured motorist coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseStricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2021-02-10HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A)
2021-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103201D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-28SenateRead second time
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103201D-S1
2021-01-25SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102246D

Same As/Similar To

SB1195 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822206(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1195
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1195+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1195S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200072D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21200072.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1195F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1195FS1171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0034+SB1195
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0148SB1195+SB1195
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0175SB1195+SB1195
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1402V0013+SB1195
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14V0020+SB1195

Bill Comments 750

feedback