VA SB1195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1195
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Provides that a policy or contract of bodily injury and property damage liability insurance for the use of a motor vehicle shall contain an endorsement or provisions obligating the insurer to make payment for injury or damage caused by an underinsured vehicle without any credit, set-off, or reduction for the available bodily injury and property damage coverage. The bill provides that a motor vehicle is underinsured when the total amount of bodily injury and property damage coverage applicable to the operation or use of the motor vehicle and available for payment for such bodily injury or property damage, is less than the total amount of damages sustained up to the total amount of uninsured motorist coverage afforded any person inured. Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle. Provides that a policy or contract of bodily injury and property damage liability insurance for the use of a motor vehicle shall contain an endorsement or provisions obligating the insurer to make payment for injury or damage caused by an underinsured vehicle without any credit, set-off, or reduction for the available bodily injury and property damage coverage. The bill provides that a motor vehicle is underinsured when the total amount of bodily injury and property damage coverage applicable to the operation or use of the motor vehicle and available for payment for such bodily injury or property damage, is less than the total amount of damages sustained up to the total amount of uninsured motorist coverage afforded any person inured.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; underinsured motor vehicle, uninsured motorist coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103201D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103201D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102246D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1195 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote