VA SB1193 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1193

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish and administer the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program (the Program). The bill provides that any dairy farmer that has a resource management plan or nutrient management plan and participates in the federal margin coverage program for dairy producers at the tier I level as contained in the federal Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 is eligible to participate in the Program. Under the bill, each year a Program participant will receive a refund of its annual premium payment paid into the federal program. Such reimbursement shall be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and shall be subject to availability of funds expressly appropriated for the purposes set forth in the chapter. The Commissioner shall submit an annual report no later than December 1 of each year to the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources assessing the effectiveness of the Program. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
2021-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1193ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-22SenateTitle replaced 21104475D-H1
2021-02-22SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1193H1
2021-02-18HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104475D-H1
2021-02-18HouseRead third time
2021-02-17HouseRead second time
2021-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104475D-H1
2021-02-10HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1193S1
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103811D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103811D-S1
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101815D

Same As/Similar To

SB1193 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
HB1750 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)
HB1750 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323304(n/a)See Bill Text
323305(n/a)See Bill Text
323306(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1193
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1193+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1193S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1193H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1193ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0331+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104475D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1193F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1193FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1193FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1193FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0018+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0090+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0161SB1193+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0193SB1193+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0197SB1193+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0198SB1193+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01V0009+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02V0017+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1710+SB1193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0259SB1193+SB1193

Bill Comments 750

feedback