VA SB1193 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Contractors; exemption from licensure; responsibility for contracting with unlicensed or unregistered person. Exempts from licensure work undertaken by a person providing construction, remodeling, repair, improvement, removal, or demolition valued at $2,500 or less per project on behalf of a properly licensed contractor, provided that such contractor holds a valid license in the residential or commercial building contractor classification. The bill provides, however, that any construction services that require an individual license or certification shall be rendered only by an individual licensed or certified by the Board for Contractors. The bill also provides that any contractor that directly employs or otherwise contracts with a person who is not credentialed by the Board for Contractors for work requiring a credential shall be solely responsible for any monetary penalty or other sanction resulting from the act of employing or contracting with a person who lacks the proper credential based upon such person's failure to obtain or maintain the required credential. This bill is identical to HB 1979.
Title
Contractors, Board for; exemptions, responsibility for contracting with unlicensed person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1193ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1193S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104814D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104814D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103399D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Contractors and Subcontractors
Professions and Occupations
Contractors and Subcontractors
Professions and Occupations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1108.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1115.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |