VA SB1192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; powers of the Director; out-of-state applicants for certification as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business. Requires, as a prerequisite for approval, that any out-of-state business applying with the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity for certification in Virginia as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business possess the equivalent certification in the business's state of origin. The bill exempts an out-of-state business located in a state that does not have a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business certification program.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; powers of the Director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1192ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103059D-E |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1192E |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103059D |