VA SB1190 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1190
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; Health Standards of Learning; advanced directive education. Directs the Board of Education to include advanced directive education in its curriculum framework for the Health Standards of Learning for high school students.
Title
Health Standards of Learning; advanced directive education for high school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1190ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (93-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102473D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1190 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote