VA SB1190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; Health Standards of Learning; advanced directive education. Directs the Board of Education to include advanced directive education in its curriculum framework for the Health Standards of Learning for high school students.
Title
Health Standards of Learning; advanced directive education for high school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102473D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1190 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote