VA SB1189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1189
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure of occupational therapists; Occupational Therapy Interjurisdictional Licensure Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Occupational Therapy Interjurisdictional Licensure Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants to practice in Compact member states, provided that they are licensed in at least one member state. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022, and directs the Board of Medicine to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The Compact takes effect when it is enacted by a tenth member state. Licensure of occupational therapists; Occupational Therapy Interjurisdictional Licensure Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Occupational Therapy Interjurisdictional Licensure Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants to practice in Compact member states, provided that they are licensed in at least one member state. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022, and directs the Board of Medicine to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The Compact takes effect when it is enacted by a tenth member state.
Title
Occupational therapists; licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101278D-E |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1189E |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101278D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote