VA SB1189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water and sewer services; liens; owners, lessees, or tenants. Separates Code provisions regarding water and sewer services provided to lessees or tenants of real property from Code provisions regarding water and sewer services provided to owners of real property. The bill removes a locality's authority to waive a required written authorization by an owner for water or sewer services provided by a locality to a lessee or tenant. A copy of the lease between the lessee or tenant and the owner is acceptable authorization.
Title
Water and sewer services; liens, owners, lessees, or tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1189ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103817D-E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1189E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Government |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103817D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2119.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2119.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |