VA SB1188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extended service contracts; bonding requirement; remedies; civil penalty. Eliminates the requirement that extended service contract providers file and maintain a bond or letter of credit with the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (VDACS). The bill also (i) requires service contracts to include a disclosure advising a purchaser that he may file a complaint with VDACS if an obligor denies or does not honor a promise made in a contract within 60 days after a request; (ii) authorizes the Commissioner of VDACS, upon receiving a complaint regarding such a request, to investigate whether there has been an improper denial or failure of a purchaser's request and require the obligor to rectify or justify any improper denial or failure; and (iii) authorizes the Commissioner to (a) issue a cease and desist order; (b) deny, suspend, or revoke the obligor's registration; or (c) assess a civil penalty if the denial or failure is not rectified or sufficiently justified. The bill includes procedural provisions concerning the Commissioner's powers to deny, suspend, or revoke an obligor's registration. This bill is identical to HB 2038.
Title
Extended service contract providers; bonding requirement, remedies, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1188ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1188S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104546D-S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104546D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102368D |