VA SB1188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses. Removes the existing provision that a person's driver's license is suspended (i) when he is convicted of or placed on deferred disposition for a drug offense and (ii) for violations not pertaining to the operator or operation of a motor vehicle. The provisions of this bill that affect the Code of Virginia have a delayed effective date of September 1, 2017.
Title
Driver's license; suspension of license for nonpayment of fines and court costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102797D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1200.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |