VA SB1187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; strategies to address resilience. Encourages localities to consider strategies to address resilience in their comprehensive plans.
Title
Comprehensive plan; encouraged to consider strategies to address resilience.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1187ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102509D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
HB1634 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
HB1634 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)