VA SB1186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Payment or delivery of small asset by affidavit; check, draft, or other negotiable instrument; financial institution. Provides that a financial institution accepting a small asset that is a check, draft, or other negotiable instrument presented for deposit by an affidavit is discharged from all claims for the amount accepted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institution; payment or delivery of small asset by affidavit, check, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1186ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101507D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
642601(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1186
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1186+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1186ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0360+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0059+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0023SB1186+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0057SB1186+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0082+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0371+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3119+SB1186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0929SB1186+SB1186

Bill Comments

feedback