VA SB1182 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1182
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle liability insurance coverage limits. Increases the motor vehicle liability insurance coverage amounts from $25,000 to $30,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of one person and from $50,000 to $60,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of two or more persons from any one accident, for policies effective between January 1, 2022, and January 1, 2025. For policies effective after January 1, 2025, the bill increases the motor vehicle liability insurance coverage amounts to $50,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of one person, $100,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of two or more persons from any one accident, and from $20,000 to $25,000 for injury to or destruction of property of others as a result of any one accident. The bill requires that self-insured operators of taxicabs maintain protection against uninsured and underinsured drivers with limits of $25,000, $50,000, and $20,000, respectively, with respect to each motor vehicle. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Motor vehicle liability insurance coverage limits. Increases the motor vehicle liability insurance coverage amounts from $25,000 to $30,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of one person and from $50,000 to $60,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of two or more persons from any one accident, for policies effective between January 1, 2022, and January 1, 2025. For policies effective after January 1, 2025, the bill increases the motor vehicle liability insurance coverage amounts to $50,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of one person, $100,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of two or more persons from any one accident, and from $20,000 to $25,000 for injury to or destruction of property of others as a result of any one accident. The bill requires that self-insured operators of taxicabs maintain protection against uninsured and underinsured drivers with limits of $25,000, $50,000, and $20,000, respectively, with respect to each motor vehicle. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Motor vehicle liability insurance; increases coverage amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1182ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 21200419D-H1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N 1-A) |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (61-Y 37-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB1182H1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendments by Delegate Heretick agreed to |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200419D-H1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200419D-H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100652D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2057 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |