VA SB1182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle liability insurance coverage limits. Increases the motor vehicle liability insurance coverage amounts from $25,000 to $50,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of one person, from $50,000 to $100,000 in cases of bodily injury to or death of more than one person in any one accident, and from $20,000 to $40,000 for damage to property of others as a result of any one accident. The bill requires that self-insured operators of taxicabs maintain protection against uninsured and underinsured drivers with the current limits of $25,000, $50,000, and $20,000, respectively. The bill applies to policies issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2022.
Title
Motor vehicle liability insurance; increases coverage amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100652D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2057 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |