VA SB1180 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Boards of Dentistry and Medicine; regulations for the prescribing of opioids and buprenorphine. Directs the Boards of Dentistry and Medicine to adopt regulations for the prescribing of opioids and products containing buprenorphine. The bill requires the Prescription Monitoring Program at the Department of Health Professions to annually provide a report to the Joint Commission on Health Care and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health on the prescribing of opioids and benzodiazepines in the Commonwealth that includes data on reporting of unusual patterns of prescribing or dispensing of a covered substance by an individual prescriber or dispenser or on potential misuse of a covered substance by a recipient. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioids and buprenorphine; Boards of Dentistry and Medicine to adopt regulations for prescribing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
2017-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective 3/20/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1180ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-21HouseDelegates: Pillion, Garrett, Hayes
2017-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-20SenateSenators: Chafin, Dunnavant, Barker
2017-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-20SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N)
2017-02-16HouseHouse requested conference committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2017-02-15SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2017-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-13HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-13HouseRead third time
2017-02-10HouseRead second time
2017-02-09HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenatePrinted as engrossed 17101154D-E
2017-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1180E
2017-01-23SenateAmendment by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
2017-01-23SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-01-23SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2017-01-23SenateRead second time
2017-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17101154D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412708.4(n/a)See Bill Text
5412928.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1180
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1180+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1180E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1180ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0682+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0047+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0075SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0087SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0195+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2227+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0541SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0692SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0870SB1180+SB1180
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2752+SB1180

Bill Comments 750

feedback