VA SB1179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Application for a resident concealed handgun permit; United States Armed Forces. Provides that for purposes of determining domicile to obtain a resident concealed handgun permit a member of the United States Armed Forces is domiciled in the county or city where such member claims his home of record with the United States Armed Forces. The bill clarifies that a member of the United States Armed Forces who is stationed outside of the Commonwealth but domiciled in the Commonwealth may apply for a resident concealed handgun permit.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; application for a resident permit by a member of U.S. Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1179ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100047D |