VA SB1179 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Health and Human Resources; workgroup to establish educational guidelines for training health care providers in the safe prescribing and appropriate use of opioids. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a workgroup that shall include representatives of the Departments of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Health, and Health Professions as well as representatives of the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia and each of the Commonwealth's medical schools, dental schools, schools of pharmacy, physician assistant education programs, and nursing education programs to develop educational standards and curricula for training health care providers, including physicians, dentists, optometrists, pharmacists, physician assistants, and nurses, in the safe and appropriate use of opioids to treat pain while minimizing the risk of addiction and substance abuse. The workgroup shall report its progress and the outcomes of its activities to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2017. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to HB 2161.
Title
Opioids; workgroup to establish guidelines for prescribing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 62 (effective 2/20/17) | |
2017-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1179ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101155D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1179E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101155D |
Subjects
Emergency Legislation
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation