VA SB1178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health carriers; nurse practitioners. Requires health insurers and health services plan providers whose policies or contracts cover services that may be legally performed by licensed nurse practitioners to provide equal coverage for such services when rendered by a licensed nurse practitioner. The bill contains an enactment that exempts the measure from the requirement that the Health Insurance Reform Commission review any legislative measure containing a mandated health insurance benefit or provider. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health carriers; services provided by nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 333 (effective 10/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1178ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100960D-E
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1178E
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100960D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823408(n/a)See Bill Text
3824221(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1178
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1178+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1178E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1178ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0333+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0124+SB1178
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1178+SB1178
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1178+SB1178
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1178+SB1178
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0152+SB1178
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2697+SB1178

Bill Comments

feedback