VA SB1175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher licensure; Teach For America license. Creates a two-year provisional license for participants in Teach For America, a nationwide nonprofit organization focused on closing the achievement gaps among students in low-income areas, who meet certain criteria, including having an offer of employment from a school division in the Commonwealth. The Board of Education may extend each Teach For America license for one additional year and may issue each licensee a renewable license upon completion of two full years of teaching experience, satisfaction of all other requirements for such a license, achievement of satisfactory scores on all professional teacher assessments required by the Board, and achievement of satisfactory end-of-year evaluations. The bill also provides for reciprocity to Teach For America teachers in other states upon satisfaction of certain conditions.
Title
Teach for America; creates two-year provisional license for participants.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053) | |
2013-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1175ER) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101504D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2084 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)