VA SB1173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; Town of Damascus allowed to revoke agreement to contribute to VRS for future creditable service. Allows the Town of Damascus, on the basis that it has not made contributions to VRS for 25 consecutive years, to revoke in writing its agreement to contribute to VRS for creditable service rendered by employees subsequent to the revocation. This is an exception to the general rule that election to participate in the Retirement System is irrevocable.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; revocation of participation by Town of Damascus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1173ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1173S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104429D-S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104429D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102440D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1885 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)