VA SB1170 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Additional local sales and use tax to support schools. Adds Isle of Wight County to the list of localities that, under current law, are authorized to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent, with the revenue used only for capital projects for the construction or renovation of schools.
Title
Isle of Wight County; authorized to impose an additional local sales and use tax to support schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Requires 26 affirmative votes for passage |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100824D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1170 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote