VA SB1170 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; resident employment and apprenticeship participation; required contract provisions. Requires all public bodies to include in every contract of more than $100,000 that involves the performance of work within the Commonwealth provisions requiring the contractor to agree (i) that 35 percent of the total hours worked by apprentices in positions created in performance of the contract be performed by Virginia residents and (ii) to use the Virginia Employment Commission as the first source of referral for obtaining qualified applicants for any new position. The required provisions do not apply to any contracts for the procurement of professional services. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; resident employment and apprenticeship participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13103432D-E |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1170E |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103432D |