VA SB1169 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Community services boards; behavioral health authorities; performance contracts. Modifies and reorganizes provisions related to the requirements of performance contracts entered into by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services with community services boards and behavioral health authorities. As introduced this bill was a recommendation of the Behavioral Health Commission and the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission. Certain subsections of the bill have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community services boards and behavioral health authorities; provisions of performance contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
2023-04-12HouseEnacted, Chapter 754 (effective - see bill)
2023-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2023-04-12SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2023-04-12SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1169ER2)
2023-04-12SenateReenrolled
2023-04-12 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2023-04-12HouseVOTE: Block Vote Adoption (93-Y 0-N)
2023-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N)
2023-04-12SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2023-03-27SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-25SenateSigned by President
2023-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1169ER)
2023-02-23SenateEnrolled
2023-02-20HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-20HouseRead third time
2023-02-17HouseRead second time
2023-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1169S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105865D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105865D-S1
2023-02-02SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
2023-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103870D

Same As/Similar To

HB2185 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
HB2185 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372203(n/a)See Bill Text
372508(n/a)See Bill Text
372608(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1169
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1169+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1169S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1169ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1169ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0754+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105865D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1169AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1169F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1169FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1169FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S04V0121+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0241SB1169+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0321SB1169+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0200+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0210+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2030+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV1027SB1169+SB1169
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2448+SB1169

Bill Comments

feedback