VA SB1165 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Abolition of the death penalty. Abolishes the death penalty, including for those persons currently under a death sentence. The bill provides that no person may be sentenced to death or put to death on or after its effective date for any violation of law. Abolition of the death penalty. Abolishes the death penalty, including for those persons currently under a death sentence. The bill provides that no person may be sentenced to death or put to death on or after its effective date for any violation of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death penalty; abolition of current penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment rejected 21104328D-S5 (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Norment rejected 21104325D-S6 (16-Y 23-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Stanley rejected 21103373D-S2 (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1165S4
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21103949D-S4
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Norment rejected 21104328D-S5 (17-Y 22-N)
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Norment rejected 21104325D-S6 (16-Y 23-N)
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell passed by temporarily
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Norment withdrawn 21103876D-S3
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Stanley rejected 21103373D-S2 (17-Y 22-N)
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103081D-S1
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateRead second time
2021-02-02SenateFloor substitute printed 21104325D-S6 (Norment)
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 21104328D-S5
2021-02-02SenateFloor substitute printed 21104328D-S5 (Norment)
2021-02-02SenateFloor substitute printed 21103949D-S4 (Surovell)
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-28SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-28SenateFloor substitute printed 21103876D-S3 (Norment)
2021-01-28SenateFloor substitute printed 21103373D-S2 (Stanley)
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2021-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103081D-S1
2021-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2021-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100656D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171310(n/a)See Bill Text
171313(n/a)See Bill Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
18210(n/a)See Bill Text
18217(n/a)See Bill Text
18218(n/a)See Bill Text
18219(n/a)See Bill Text
18222(n/a)See Bill Text
18225(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.01(n/a)See Bill Text
18226(n/a)See Bill Text
18230(n/a)See Bill Text
18231(n/a)See Bill Text
18232(n/a)See Bill Text
1828(n/a)See Bill Text
192100(n/a)See Bill Text
192102(n/a)See Bill Text
19211.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192157(n/a)See Bill Text
192159(n/a)See Bill Text
192163(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.7(n/a)See Bill Text
192163.8(n/a)See Bill Text
192169.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192175(n/a)See Bill Text
192217.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192247(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192270.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192299(n/a)See Bill Text
192299.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192311(n/a)See Bill Text
192319(n/a)See Bill Text
192321.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.11(n/a)See Bill Text
192327.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192400(n/a)See Bill Text
19271(n/a)See Bill Text
19276.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
531204(n/a)See Bill Text
531229(n/a)See Bill Text
531230(n/a)See Bill Text
531232(n/a)See Bill Text
531236(n/a)See Bill Text
5413307(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.10(n/a)See Bill Text
801654(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801654.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1165
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S4+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S5+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1165S6+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103876D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS2160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS3160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS4160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS6160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1165FS5160+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0044+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0063+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0148SB1165+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0253SB1165+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0254SB1165+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0255SB1165+SB1165
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0273SB1165+SB1165

Bill Comments

feedback