VA SB1161 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; membership. Clarifies that each of the six nonlegislative citizen members of the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board) who is not an at-large member is to be appointed by the Governor from a list of two qualified nominees submitted for each vacancy by the Board and the Board of Directors of the Virginia Association of Soil and Water Conservation Districts (the Association) in consultation with other groups. The bill also requires each of the six nonlegislative citizen members to be a resident of a different one of the six geographic areas represented in the Association. The bill contains technical amendments. Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; membership. Clarifies that each of the six nonlegislative citizen members of the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board) who is not an at-large member is to be appointed by the Governor from a list of two qualified nominees submitted for each vacancy by the Board and the Board of Directors of the Virginia Association of Soil and Water Conservation Districts (the Association) in consultation with other groups. The bill also requires each of the six nonlegislative citizen members to be a resident of a different one of the six geographic areas represented in the Association. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; clarifies membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1161S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103248D-S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103248D-S1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100954D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1161 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote