VA SB1160 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1160
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; liens; abandoned vehicles; removing vehicles involved in accidents. Modernizes and improves enforcement of mechanics' and storage liens by (i) transferring notification and auction posting requirements to the Department of Motor Vehicles (the Department); (ii) allowing for independent appraisals to establish accurate vehicle values; (iii) expanding vehicle owner searches to other states and requiring the Department to notify owners in those states; and (iv) creating a limited process for relinquishing mechanics' and storage liens. The bill permits out-of-state requesters to obtain Virginia vehicle information for mechanics' or storage liens or abandoned vehicle enforcement in their states, and clarifies disposal rights, auction requirements, and titling documentation for abandoned vehicles. The Department is authorized to collect administrative fees to cover the expenses associated with these duties. The bill also provides that an entity acting at the direction of law enforcement or the Department of Transportation to remove a vehicle or cargo after an accident shall not be liable for damages or claims resulting from exercise of authority, provided that the entity acted reasonably. The provisions of this bill related to mechanics' and storage liens have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Vehicles; liens; abandoned vehicles; removing vehicles involved in accidents. Modernizes and improves enforcement of mechanics' and storage liens by (i) transferring notification and auction posting requirements to the Department of Motor Vehicles (the Department); (ii) allowing for independent appraisals to establish accurate vehicle values; (iii) expanding vehicle owner searches to other states and requiring the Department to notify owners in those states; and (iv) creating a limited process for relinquishing mechanics' and storage liens. The bill permits out-of-state requesters to obtain Virginia vehicle information for mechanics' or storage liens or abandoned vehicle enforcement in their states, and clarifies disposal rights, auction requirements, and titling documentation for abandoned vehicles. The Department is authorized to collect administrative fees to cover the expenses associated with these duties. The bill also provides that an entity acting at the direction of law enforcement or the Department of Transportation to remove a vehicle or cargo after an accident shall not be liable for damages or claims resulting from exercise of authority, provided that the entity acted reasonably. The provisions of this bill related to mechanics' and storage liens have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Removal of vehicles involved in accidents; lien of keeper of vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective - see bill) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1160ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendments by Delegate McQuinn agreed to |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1160S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103320D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103320D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100739D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1160 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote