VA SB1159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/19)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Family life education; female genital mutilation. Requires any family life education curriculum offered by a local school division to incorporate age-appropriate elements of effective and evidence-based programs on the harmful physical and emotional effects of female genital mutilation, associated criminal penalties, and the rights of the victim including any civil action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family life education; female genital mutilation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 16-N) (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1159ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateTitle replaced 19106845D-H1
2019-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 16-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute (76-Y 16-N)
2019-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1159H1
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106845D-H1
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106845D-H1
2019-02-13HouseReported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100431D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1159
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1159+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1159H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1159ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0041+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1159+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0122SB1159+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0036+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0139+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2866+SB1159
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0796SB1159+SB1159

Bill Comments

feedback