VA SB1158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Port of Virginia tax credits; sunset. Extends the sunset for the international trade facility tax credit, the barge and rail usage tax credit, and the port volume increase tax credit from taxable years before January 1, 2022, to taxable years before January 1, 2025.
Title
Port of Virginia tax credits; extends the sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102042D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |