VA SB1156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Building Authority; Military Mission Improvement and Expansion projects. Authorizes the Virginia Public Building Authority to finance or assist in the financing of certain activities connected with Military Mission Improvement and Expansion projects (MMIE projects), defined by the bill as a project or projects recommended by the Commission on Military Installations and Defense Activities and approved by the Governor that are designed to improve, expand, develop, or redevelop a federal or state military installation to enhance such installation's military value.
Title
Virginia Public Building Authority; Military Mission Improvement and Expansion projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100588D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2261 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |