VA SB1155 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1155

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital outlay plan; repeals existing six-year capital outlay for projects to be funded.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094)
2021-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 94 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1155ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16SenateTitle replaced 21104476D-H1
2021-02-16SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1155H1
2021-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104476D-H1
2021-02-12HouseRead third time
2021-02-11HouseRead second time
2021-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104476D-H1
2021-02-10HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-07HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102189D-E
2021-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1155E
2021-01-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-21SenateRead second time
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102189D

Same As/Similar To

SB1155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
HB2177 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)
HB2177 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1155
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1155+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1155E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1155H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1155ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0094+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1155AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104476D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1155F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1155FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1155FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1155FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0042+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0048SB1155+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0073SB1155+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02V0011+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1523+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1524+SB1155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0053SB1155+SB1155

Bill Comments 750

feedback