VA SB1152 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1152
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Appomattox. Shifts local elections for the Town of Appomattox from May to November and staggers the election of members of the town council. The bill makes organizational changes to provisions related to the election and appointment of town officers.
Title
Appomattox, Town of; amending charter, shifts local elections from May to November, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1152ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101480D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
HB1858 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
HB1858 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
HB1858 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
HB1858 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)