VA SB1152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Advisory Committee; member terms. Increases from two to four the number of consecutive four-year terms a nonlegislative citizen member is allowed to serve on the Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Advisory Committee (the Committee), which oversees the distribution of funds raised by the sale of Friend of the Chesapeake license plates. The bill provides that the two citizen members of the Committee who are appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, both of whose terms expire on July 1, 2019, shall have their terms extended until July 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021, respectively. One of the two members appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates shall have the expiration of his term extended from July 1, 2019, until July 1, 2022. Such extensions shall not constitute a term in determining each member's eligibility for reappointment under the limit of four consecutive terms provided by the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Advisory Committee; increases member terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1152ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102314D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1152
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1152+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1152ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0350+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0020+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1152+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1152+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1152+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0061+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0146+SB1152
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3118+SB1152

Bill Comments

feedback