VA SB1150 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1150

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Veterans Services; Military Spouse Liaison; position created. Establishes the position of Military Spouse Liaison (the Liaison) in the Department of Veterans Services to conduct outreach and advocate on behalf of military spouses in the Commonwealth. The bill directs the Liaison to report by December 1 of each year through the Commissioner of the Department of Veterans Services to the Secretary of Veterans and Defense Affairs, the Governor, and the General Assembly on the work of the Liaison and any legislative recommendations. Department of Veterans Services; Military Spouse Liaison; position created. Establishes the position of Military Spouse Liaison (the Liaison) in the Department of Veterans Services to conduct outreach and advocate on behalf of military spouses in the Commonwealth. The bill directs the Liaison to report by December 1 of each year through the Commissioner of the Department of Veterans Services to the Secretary of Veterans and Defense Affairs, the Governor, and the General Assembly on the work of the Liaison and any legislative recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Spouse Liaison; position created in Department of Veterans Services, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
2021-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 309 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1150ER)
2021-03-09SenateEnrolled
2021-02-25SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-24HousePassed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N1-A)
2021-02-24HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
2021-02-24HousePassed House with amendments (97-Y 1-N)
2021-02-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2021-02-24HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-24HouseRead third time
2021-02-23HouseRead second time
2021-02-22HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101031D-E
2021-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1150E
2021-01-28SenateAmendment by Senator Kiggans agreed to
2021-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-28SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-28SenateRead second time
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101031D

Same As/Similar To

SB1150 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222002.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1150
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1150+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1150E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1150ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0309+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1150AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200029A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1150AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1150AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1150F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1150FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1150FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0011+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0055+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0148SB1150+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0168SB1150+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101V0004+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0020+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0207V0003+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0207V0010+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02V0049+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1921+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1940+SB1150
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0426SB1150+SB1150

Bill Comments 750

feedback