VA SB1148 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1148
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; date of June primary election. Changes the date of the primary election held in June from the second Tuesday in June to the third Tuesday in June. The bill also changes candidate filing deadlines to reflect the change of date. Elections; date of June primary election. Changes the date of the primary election held in June from the second Tuesday in June to the third Tuesday in June. The bill also changes candidate filing deadlines to reflect the change of date.
Title
Elections; date of June primary election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 239 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1148ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendment (82-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101028D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1148 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |