VA SB1144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; oyster planting grounds; notice of application for lease. Requires the Marine Resources Commission (the Commission) to post notice of an application to lease oyster planting grounds for 30 days on its website and to notify by mail any current holders of adjoining leases, and riparian owners within 200 feet of the selected grounds. Current law requires posting of notice at the local courthouse for 60 days. The bill (i) reduces from four weeks to two weeks the period during which the Commission is required to publish weekly notice of the application in a newspaper and (ii) requires all forms of notice to invite written comments. The bill also provides that the applicant shall bear the cost of notice.
Title
Oyster planting grounds; Marine Resources Commission to post.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250) | |
2017-02-24 | House | Enacted, Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1144ER2) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1144ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17100832D-E |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1144E |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100832D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Computer Services and Uses
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds
Computer Services and Uses
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds