VA SB1141 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1141

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Hampton Roads area refuse collection authority; financial planning. Changes various requirements of the Southeastern Public Service Authority (the Authority) when budgeting or incurring debt, including (i) changing the required five-year overall strategic plan to a financial plan, (ii) specifying that detailed financial plans be made only when incurring long-term debt or issuing new debt, (iii) authorizing other qualified financial consultants instead of a certified public accountant to assist in the creation of the detailed financial plan, (iv) changing from the Authority's Board of Directors to the Authority the body that performs a due diligence investigation of the appropriateness of issuing new debt, and (v) and raising the permissible threshold for the executive director of the authority to execute or commit the authority to a contract, memorandum of agreement, or memorandum of understanding without acquiring Board approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hampton Roads area refuse collection authority; financial planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HouseRead third time
2021-02-23HouseRead second time
2021-02-19HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101888D

Same As/Similar To

SB1141 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1525102.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback