VA SB1140 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Tabled in Appropriations (11-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; training; powers and duties of guardian; annual reports by guardians; information required. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to develop and provide training for court-appointed guardians by July 1, 2024. The bill requires an appointed guardian, except a guardian who is licensed to practice law in the Commonwealth, and any staff employed by such guardian to perform guardianship duties to complete the initial training developed by the Department within four months of the date of the initial court order of appointment and guardians and such staff appointed prior to July 1, 2024, shall complete such training by January 1, 2026. The bill further requires a guardian to include in his annual report to the local department of social services a statement as to whether such training has been completed. Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; training; powers and duties of guardian; annual reports by guardians; information required. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to develop and provide training for court-appointed guardians by July 1, 2024. The bill requires an appointed guardian, except a guardian who is licensed to practice law in the Commonwealth, and any staff employed by such guardian to perform guardianship duties to complete the initial training developed by the Department within four months of the date of the initial court order of appointment and guardians and such staff appointed prior to July 1, 2024, shall complete such training by January 1, 2026. The bill further requires a guardian to include in his annual report to the local department of social services a statement as to whether such training has been completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DARS; training, powers, and duties of guardian.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-20HouseTabled in Appropriations (11-Y 9-N)
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 23106978D-H1
2023-02-16HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-13HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-02SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 23102600D-E
2023-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1140E
2023-02-02SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-02-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-02-02SenateRead second time
2023-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-27SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2023-01-18SenateRereferred from Judiciary (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102600D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515150(n/a)See Bill Text
6422019(n/a)See Bill Text
6422020(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1140
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1140+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1140E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1140H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104977A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1140AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106978D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1140F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1140FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1140FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0030+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S09V0040+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0151+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0193SB1140+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0209SB1140+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0210SB1140+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0221+SB1140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0242+SB1140

Bill Comments

feedback